Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/10/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/29/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/20/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/20/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/02/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/04/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/04/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/04/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 06/11/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/11/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/11/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/11/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/11/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/12/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/23/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/08/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/08/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/08/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/09/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/10/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/15/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/15/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/16/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/17/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/17/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/04/2003
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/09/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/10/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/10/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/17/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/17/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/24/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/08/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/08/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/15/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/15/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/21/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/28/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/04/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 11/18/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 12/08/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/10/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/24/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/20/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/25/2004