Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/04/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/10/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/10/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/24/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/16/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/17/2004
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/25/2004