There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Keeping America's Promise to Steel Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reinstate the safeguard measures imposed on imports of certain steel products, as in effect on December 4, 2003.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/08/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
12/17/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
12/08/2003Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/08/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (77)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 12/08/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/10/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/26/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/26/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/26/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/09/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/09/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/09/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/11/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/11/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/16/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/16/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/16/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/25/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means12/08/2003 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade12/17/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3699. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/08/2003)

Keeping America's Promise to Steel Act - Reinstates the safeguard measures implemented under Proclamation 7529 of March 5, 2002, which imposed a tariff on certain steel products, and nullifies Proclamation 7741 of December 4, 2003, lifting such measures.