Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 12/08/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/10/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/26/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/26/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/26/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/09/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/09/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/09/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/11/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/11/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/16/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/16/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/16/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/25/2004