Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/28/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/04/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/04/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/10/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/25/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/25/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/25/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/02/2004