Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/28/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/04/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/26/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/09/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/10/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/10/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/10/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/16/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/16/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/18/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/18/2004
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/18/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/23/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/23/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/23/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/23/2004
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/23/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/23/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/24/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/24/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/24/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/25/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/25/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/25/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/25/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/30/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/30/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 03/30/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 03/30/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/30/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/01/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/01/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/01/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/22/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/22/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/11/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/11/2004
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/11/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/18/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/19/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/01/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/01/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/16/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/22/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/12/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/12/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/14/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/21/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/21/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/21/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/30/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/17/2004