Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 01/21/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/27/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/28/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/28/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/28/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/03/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/03/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 02/03/2004
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/03/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 02/03/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/03/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 02/03/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/03/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/03/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/03/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/03/2004
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/03/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/03/2004
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 02/03/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/03/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/03/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 02/03/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/03/2004
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/04/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/04/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/04/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/04/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 02/04/2004
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/04/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/04/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 02/04/2004
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 02/10/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/10/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/10/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/10/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/10/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/10/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/10/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/10/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/10/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/10/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/10/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/10/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/10/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 02/10/2004
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/10/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/10/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/10/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 02/10/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 02/10/2004
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/10/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/11/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/24/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/24/2004
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/24/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/24/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/24/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/24/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/24/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/24/2004
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/26/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/02/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/02/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/02/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/02/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/02/2004
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/02/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/04/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/04/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/04/2004