There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Freedom of Choice Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit, consistent with Roe v. Wade, the interference by the government with a woman's right to choose to bear a child or terminate a pregnancy, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/21/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/01/2004Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/21/2004Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/21/2004Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (87)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/21/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/03/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/03/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/03/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/03/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/03/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/03/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/03/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/03/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/03/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/03/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 02/03/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/03/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/03/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/03/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/03/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/03/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 02/03/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/24/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/24/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/24/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/24/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/24/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/24/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/24/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/24/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/24/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/26/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/26/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/26/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/04/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/04/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/04/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/04/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/04/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/04/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/10/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/10/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/10/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/10/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/10/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/10/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/18/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/18/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/18/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/02/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/02/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/02/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/02/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/02/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/02/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/22/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/22/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/05/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/05/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/05/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/15/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/15/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/15/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/22/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/21/2004 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution03/01/2004 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3719. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/21/2004)

Freedom of Choice Act - Declares that it is the policy of the United States that every woman has the fundamental right to choose to: (1) bear a child; (2) terminate a pregnancy prior to fetal viability; or (3) terminate it after fetal viability when necessary to protect her life or her health.

Prohibits a governmental entity from : (1) denying or interfering with a woman's right to exercise such choices; or (2) discriminating against the exercise of those rights in its regulation or provision of benefits, facilities, services, or information.

Authorizes an individual aggrieved by a violation of this Act to obtain appropriate relief, including relief against a governmental entity in a civil action.

States that this Act applies to every Federal, State, and local statute, ordinance, regulation, administrative order, decision, policy, practice, or other action enacted, adopted, or implemented before, on, or after the date of enactment of this Act.