Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/21/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/21/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/03/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/03/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/03/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/03/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/03/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/03/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/03/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/03/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/03/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/03/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 02/03/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/03/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/03/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/03/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/03/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/03/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 02/03/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/24/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/24/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/24/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/24/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/24/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/24/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/24/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/24/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/24/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/26/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/26/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/26/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/04/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/04/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/04/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/04/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/04/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/04/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/10/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/10/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/10/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/10/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/10/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/10/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/18/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/18/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/18/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/02/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/02/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/02/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/02/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/02/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/02/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/22/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/22/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/05/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/05/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/05/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/15/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/15/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/15/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/22/2004