There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Undocumented Alien Emergency Medical Assistance Amendments of 2004

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 1011 of the Medicare Prescription Drug, Improvement, and Modernization Act of 2003 to impose conditions on Federal reimbursement of emergency health services furnished to undocumented aliens.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/18/2004 Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 88 - 331 (Roll no. 182).(text: CR 5/17/2004 H3033-3034)
01/21/2004 Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
05/18/2004-12:21pm On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 88 - 331 (Roll no. 182). (text: CR 5/17/2004 H3033-3034)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/18/2004-12:13pm Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3107)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/2004-3:48pm At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/2004-2:54pm DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3722.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/2004-2:54pm Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3033-3044)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/2004-2:54pm Mr. Barton (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2004 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/21/2004 Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/21/2004 Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H82-87)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/21/2004 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/12/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/12/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/12/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/21/2004 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/03/2004 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.3722.

Subjects (43)

  • Administrative procedure
  • Alien labor
  • Aliens
  • Ambulances
  • Collection of accounts
  • Computer software
  • Congressional reporting requirements
  • Cost accounting
  • Data banks
  • Department of Homeland Security
  • Deportation
  • Electronic data interchange
  • Electronic government information
  • Emergency medicine
  • Employee health benefits
  • Employers' liability
  • Federal aid to health facilities
  • Fingerprints
  • Government paperwork
  • Health insurance
  • Hospital care
  • Hospitals
  • Identification devices
  • Illegal aliens
  • Immigrant health
  • Medical records
  • Negotiations
  • Tax returns
  • Treaties
  • Workers' compensation

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3722. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/21/2004)

Undocumented Alien Emergency Medical Assistance Amendments of 2004 - Amends the Medicare Prescription Drug, Improvement, and Modernization Act of 2003 to: (1) prohibit Federal reimbursement of hospital-provided emergency and certain transportation services to undocumented aliens unless the hospital provides the Secretary of Homeland Security with information regarding an alien's citizenship, immigration status, financial data, and employer; (2) make the employer of certain undocumented aliens responsible for such costs; and (3) direct the Secretary to initiate removal procedures against an alien determined to be removable under Federal immigration law.

Directs the Secretary of State to analyze the feasibility of effecting treaties for international medical evacuations.