Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/24/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/24/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/24/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/09/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/09/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/09/2004
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/09/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/09/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/18/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/18/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/18/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/30/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/30/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/30/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/30/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/30/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/30/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/30/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/30/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/30/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/30/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/30/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/02/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/02/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/02/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/02/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/02/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/02/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/22/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/04/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/04/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/04/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/04/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/04/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/04/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/04/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/04/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/12/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/12/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/12/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/12/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/12/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/12/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/12/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/12/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 05/12/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/20/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/20/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/20/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/20/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/08/2004
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/08/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/08/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/08/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/08/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/08/2004
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/18/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/18/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/18/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/18/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/18/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/18/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/25/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/25/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/25/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/25/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/25/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/07/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/12/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/12/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/12/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/20/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/22/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/08/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/08/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/08/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/08/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/08/2004
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/08/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/08/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/08/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/08/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/08/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/08/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 09/08/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/08/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/08/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/08/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/08/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/08/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/08/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/14/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/14/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/14/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/14/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/14/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/14/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/21/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/21/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/21/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/21/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/21/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/21/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/21/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/21/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 09/21/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/28/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/28/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/28/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/28/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/28/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/28/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/28/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/28/2004
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/28/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/28/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/05/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/05/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/05/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/05/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/05/2004
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/05/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/06/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 10/06/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/06/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/06/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/06/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/07/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/07/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 10/08/2004
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 10/08/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/08/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/17/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/17/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/17/2004
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 11/17/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/17/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 11/17/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/20/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/20/2004