Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/27/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 01/27/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 01/27/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/03/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/03/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/03/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/03/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/03/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/03/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/03/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/03/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/03/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/03/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 02/03/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/03/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/03/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/03/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/03/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/03/2004
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/03/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/24/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/24/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/24/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/11/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/30/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/22/2004