Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/27/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/27/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/27/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/27/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 02/27/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/12/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/13/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/18/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/18/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/19/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/19/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/25/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/25/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/25/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/25/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/25/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/03/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/01/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 05/08/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/13/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/22/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/09/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/09/2003
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 06/17/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/24/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/24/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/09/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/14/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/15/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/15/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/25/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/03/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/24/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/24/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 10/21/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/28/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 10/28/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/29/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/04/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/04/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 11/04/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/04/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/18/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/19/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/20/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/20/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 12/08/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 12/08/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 03/11/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/18/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/23/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/17/2004