Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/03/2004
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/03/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/03/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 02/03/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/03/2004
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/03/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 02/03/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 02/03/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/03/2004
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/10/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/10/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/10/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/10/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/10/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/02/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/02/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/02/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/10/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/10/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/10/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/16/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/23/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/23/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/24/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/31/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/28/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/28/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/30/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/30/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/30/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/30/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/04/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/04/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/04/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/04/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 05/04/2004
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/05/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/17/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/17/2004
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/17/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/17/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/17/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/01/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/01/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/01/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/01/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/02/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/16/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/22/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/25/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/25/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/08/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/14/2004