There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Popular Titles

HEALTHY Vets Act (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Help Establish Access to Local Timely Healthcare for Your Vets (HEALTHY Vets) Act of 2004

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to enter into contracts with community health care providers to improve access to health care for veterans in highly rural areas, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/04/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/13/2004Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/04/2004Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/2004Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/04/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 02/11/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/11/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/11/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/02/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/02/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/27/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/27/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/27/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/27/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/28/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/28/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/28/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/28/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/28/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/05/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/05/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/06/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/11/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/20/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/02/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/08/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/04/2004 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health04/13/2004 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3777.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3777. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/04/2004)

Help Establish Access to Local Timely Healthcare for Your Vets (HEALTHY Vets) Act of 2004 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, in the case of a veteran for whom Department of Veterans Affairs medical facilities are geographically inaccessible, to use current authority for contracting out veterans' medical care to non-Department facilities in order to provide the following care to such veterans: (1) primary care; (2) acute or chronic symptom management; (3) nontherapeutic medical services; and (4) other medical services determined appropriate by the director of that geographic service region, after consultation with the Department physician responsible for the primary care of the veteran. Outlines conditions under which Department facilities shall be deemed geographically inaccessible. Authorizes the Secretary to waive the requirement of geographic inaccessibility, on a case-by-case basis, if the Secretary determines that the costs to the Department of providing such care significantly outweigh the benefits of localized health care for the veteran.