Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/04/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 02/11/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/11/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/11/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/02/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/02/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/27/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/27/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/27/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/27/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/28/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/28/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/28/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/28/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/28/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/05/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/05/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/06/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/11/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/20/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/02/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/08/2004