Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/04/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/04/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/11/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/11/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/11/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/11/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/24/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/09/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/13/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/01/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/01/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/01/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/01/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/01/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/02/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/02/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/15/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/15/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/23/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/23/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/23/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/07/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/13/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/07/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/07/2004