Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/10/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/03/2004
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/31/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/20/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/27/2004