Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/25/2004
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/04/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/04/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/04/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/04/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/04/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/17/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/25/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/01/2004
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/01/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/01/2004
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/01/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/01/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/01/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/20/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/17/2004