Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/24/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/10/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/10/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/10/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/11/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/18/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/18/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/25/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/01/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/27/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/27/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/27/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/05/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/18/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/18/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/02/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/18/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/25/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/13/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/13/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/15/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 07/19/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/09/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/23/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/23/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/07/2004