There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

First Amendment Restoration Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to repeal the requirement that persons making disbursements for electioneering communications file reports on such disbursements with the Federal Election Commission and the prohibition against the making of disbursements for electioneering communications by corporations and labor organizations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/11/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/11/2004Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2004Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/25/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/25/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/25/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 02/26/2004
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/02/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/02/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/02/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/02/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/02/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/09/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/09/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/09/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/11/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/11/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/11/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/11/2004
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/18/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/24/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/24/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/24/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 03/24/2004
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/24/2004
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 03/24/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/24/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/24/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/24/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/24/2004
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/30/2004
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/30/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/30/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/20/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/20/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/22/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/04/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/04/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/04/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/04/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/10/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/10/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/10/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/13/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/13/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/19/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/19/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/20/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/21/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/23/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/22/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration02/11/2004 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3801. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/11/2004)

First Amendment Restoration Act - Amends the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to repeal: (1) a requirement that persons making disbursements for electioneering communications file reports on such disbursements with the Federal Election Commission; (2) a prohibition against the making of disbursements for electioneering communications by corporations and labor organizations; and (3) a provision treating coordinated communications as contributions.