Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/25/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/25/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/25/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 02/26/2004
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/02/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/02/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/02/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/02/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/02/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/09/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/09/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/09/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/11/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/11/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/11/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/11/2004
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/18/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/24/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/24/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/24/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 03/24/2004
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/24/2004
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 03/24/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/24/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/24/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/24/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/24/2004
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/30/2004
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/30/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/30/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/20/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/20/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/22/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/04/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/04/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/04/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/04/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/10/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/10/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/10/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/13/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/13/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/19/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/19/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/20/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/21/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/23/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/22/2004