Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/26/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/26/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/26/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/26/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/26/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/09/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/09/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/09/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/09/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/09/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/09/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/09/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/09/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/09/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/09/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/11/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/11/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/11/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/11/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/11/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/11/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/11/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/11/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/16/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/16/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/16/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/16/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/16/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/16/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/16/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/24/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/24/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/24/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/24/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/24/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/24/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/24/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/02/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/22/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/22/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/30/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/30/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/30/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/11/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/11/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/12/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 05/12/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/12/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/20/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/20/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/20/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/20/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/14/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/14/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/13/2004