Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/11/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/11/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/11/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/11/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/11/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/11/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 02/11/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/11/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/26/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/26/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/26/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 02/26/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/26/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/25/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/25/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/03/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/08/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/23/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/23/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/23/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/09/2004