Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 02/24/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/16/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/16/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/16/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/16/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/16/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/16/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/16/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/16/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/16/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/16/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/16/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/16/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/16/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/16/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/16/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/16/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/16/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/16/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/16/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/20/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/20/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/20/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/20/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/20/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/20/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/20/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/05/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/17/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/07/2004