Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/25/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/25/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/02/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/02/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/04/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/09/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/30/2004