Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/26/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 02/26/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/26/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/09/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/09/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/09/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/11/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/24/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/24/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/31/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/01/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 04/20/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/01/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/14/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/17/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/13/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/30/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/16/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 12/07/2004