Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/26/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/26/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/26/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 03/04/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/04/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/04/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/04/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/04/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/04/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/04/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/04/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/04/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/04/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/04/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/04/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 03/04/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/04/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/04/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/04/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/04/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/04/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/04/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/04/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/04/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/04/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/04/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/04/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/04/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/04/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/04/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/04/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/04/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/04/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/04/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/04/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/04/2004
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/09/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/09/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/09/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/09/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/09/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/09/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/09/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/09/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/09/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/18/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/18/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/18/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/18/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/18/2004
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/18/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/18/2004
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/18/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/18/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/18/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/18/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/18/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/18/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/18/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/18/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/18/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/18/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/18/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/18/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 03/18/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/18/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/18/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/02/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/02/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/02/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 04/02/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/02/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/02/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/02/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 04/02/2004
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/02/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 04/02/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/22/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/22/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/22/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/22/2004
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/28/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/13/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/13/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/13/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/14/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/14/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 06/14/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/14/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/14/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/14/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/14/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/14/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/14/2004
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/14/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/14/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/14/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/14/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/14/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/16/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/16/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/16/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/16/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/16/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/16/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/16/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/16/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/16/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/16/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/16/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/16/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/16/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/18/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/24/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/24/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/24/2004
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/24/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/25/2004
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 07/09/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/09/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/09/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/22/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/22/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/07/2004
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/07/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/07/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/28/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 09/29/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/30/2004