Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/01/2004
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 03/01/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 03/01/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/01/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/03/2004
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/18/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/18/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/24/2004
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/27/2004