Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/03/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/03/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/04/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/04/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/04/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/04/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/10/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/10/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/10/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/10/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/18/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/18/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/18/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/18/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/18/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/18/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/24/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/24/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/24/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/24/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/24/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/24/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/24/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/24/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/24/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/24/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/25/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/25/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/25/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/25/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/25/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/25/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/25/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/29/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/29/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/29/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/29/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/29/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/29/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/29/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/29/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/29/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/29/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/29/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/29/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/30/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/30/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/30/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/30/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/30/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/30/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/30/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/31/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/31/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/31/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/31/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/01/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/01/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/01/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/02/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/02/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/02/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/02/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/21/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/21/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/21/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/21/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/21/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/11/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/11/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/11/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/11/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/11/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/11/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/11/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/11/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/11/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/11/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/11/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/11/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/13/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/22/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/21/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/22/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/07/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/08/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/06/2004