Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/21/2004 Became Public Law No: 108-467.
12/21/2004 Signed by President.
12/10/2004 Presented to President.
12/07/2004 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/07/2004 Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11877)
07/21/2004 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6500)
06/21/2004 Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 108-557.
03/03/2004 Introduced in House