Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/03/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/03/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/03/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/08/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/08/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/08/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/09/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/09/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/09/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/11/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/11/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/23/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/23/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/29/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/30/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/02/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/02/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/13/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/14/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/20/2004