Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/18/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/23/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/24/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/24/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/24/2004
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/29/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/29/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/29/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/30/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/30/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/01/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/01/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/22/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/30/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/13/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/17/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew