Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/25/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/20/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/01/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/07/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/20/2004