Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 03/04/2004
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/04/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/04/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 03/04/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/10/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 03/10/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/10/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/10/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/18/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/18/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/18/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/25/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/31/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/21/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/21/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/05/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 06/02/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/02/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/02/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/22/2004