Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/08/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/08/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/08/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/08/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/08/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/08/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/08/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 03/08/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/08/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/08/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/10/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/11/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/23/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/01/2004