Text: H.R.3915 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-205 (03/15/2004)

 
[108th Congress Public Law 205]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


[DOCID: f:publ205.108]

[[Page 118 STAT. 553]]

Public Law 108-205
108th Congress

                                 An Act


 
  To provide for an additional temporary extension of programs  under the Small Business Act and the Small Business Investment Act of 1958 
through April 2, 2004, and for other purposes. 
                <<NOTE: Mar. 15, 2004 -  [H.R. 3915]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. ADDITIONAL TEMPORARY EXTENSION OF AUTHORIZATION OF PROGRAMS 
            UNDER THE SMALL BUSINESS ACT AND THE SMALL BUSINESS 
            INVESTMENT ACT OF 1958.

    The authorization for any program, authority, or provision, 
including any pilot program, that was extended through March 15, 2004, 
by section 1(a) of Public Law 108-172 <<NOTE: 117 Stat. 2065.>>  is 
further extended through April 2, 2004, under the same terms and 
conditions.

SEC. 2. EXTENSION OF CERTAIN FEE AUTHORIZATIONS.

    Section 503(f) of the Small Business Investment Act of 1958 (15 
U.S.C. 697(f)) is amended by striking ``October 1, 2003'' and inserting 
``May 21, 2004''.

    Approved March 15, 2004.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 3915:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 150 (2004):
            Mar. 10, considered and passed House.
            Mar. 12, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>