Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/09/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/24/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/24/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/24/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/29/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/30/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/04/2004
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 05/04/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/04/2004