Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/10/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/30/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/20/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/20/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/29/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/06/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/16/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/18/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/23/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/21/2004