There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Deficit Control Act of 2004

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Congressional Budget Act of 1974 and the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 to reform Federal budget procedures, provide for budget discipline, accurately account for Government spending, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/10/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date
11/22/2004House Committee on The Budget Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 10, 2004.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/19/2004House Committee on The Budget Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 22, 2004.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/01/2004House Committee on The Budget Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 19, 2004.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/22/2004House Committee on The Budget Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 1, 2004.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/01/2004House Committee on The Budget Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than July 23, 2004.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/08/2004Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Efficiency and Financial Management.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
04/08/2004Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service and Agency Organization.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
03/10/2004Referred to House Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
03/10/2004Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
03/10/2004Referred to House Rules
Action By: House of Representatives
03/10/2004Referred to House Budget
Action By: House of Representatives
03/10/2004Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, Ways and Means, and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/10/2004Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Budget03/10/2004 Referred to
House Rules03/10/2004 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/10/2004 Referred to
House Government Reform03/10/2004 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Civil Service and Agency Organization04/08/2004 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Government Efficiency and Financial Management04/08/2004 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3925.


Subjects (90)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3925. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/10/2004)

Deficit Control Act of 2004 - Amends the Congressional Budget Act of 1974 to require annual joint (currently, concurrent) budget resolutions signed by the President.

Sets forth provisions regarding the establishment of a reserve fund for emergencies. Eliminates inflation adjustments.

Amends the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 (Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act) to provide spending caps on the growth of entitlements and mandatory budget outlays. Excludes from such limits any benefits payable under title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act (SSA) (as well as old age, survivors, and disability insurance under SSA title II and Tier 1 railroad retirement benefits, as under current law), along with specified Government accounts and activities (including existing exemptions). Revises other existing exceptions, limitations, and special rules with respect to sequestration exemptions, removing Medicare benefits from the current list.

Sets limits on discretionary spending programs for FY 2006 through FY 2014, specifying such limits each fiscal year for the nondefense category. Provides for points of order against any increase in such limits.

Establishes a procedure for enhanced and expedited consideration by Congress of rescissions proposed by the President.

Establishes the Commission to Eliminate Waste, Fraud, and Abuse.

Provides for accrual funding of the: (1) Civil Service Retirement and Disability Fund; (2) Central Intelligence Agency Retirement and Disability System; (3) Foreign Service Retirement and Disability System; and (4) post-retirement health benefits costs for Federal employees.

Establishes in the Treasury: (1) the Public Health Service Commissioned Corps Retirement Fund; (2) the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Commissioned Officer Corps Retirement System; and (3) the Coast Guard Military Retirement Fund.

Changes the name of the Department of Defense Medicare-Eligible Retiree Health Care Fund to Uniformed Services Health Care Fund (thus, providing health care programs for all uniformed service retirees, under certain conditions). (Currently, such programs are for Department of Defense Medicare-eligible beneficiaries).

Decreases the limit on the public debt from $7.384 trillion to $4.393 trillion.

Amends the Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act to extend: (1) certain budget enforcement requirements through FY 2014; (2) PAYGO requirements through FY 2018; and (3) PAYGO requirements through FY 2014 to provide for an offsetting sequestration for direct spending and receipts legislation enacted before October 1, 2014, that causes a net deficit increase.

Declares that the term "receipts legislation" does not include provisions of a bill or joint resolution amending the Internal Revenue Code that increases the deficit, if the amount of deficit increase does not exceed for any fiscal year covered by such resolution the amount by which the aggregate level of Federal revenues should be decreased under it.