Committees: H.R.3936 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/11/2004 Referred to
05/19/2004 Markup by
06/25/2004 Reported by H. Rept. 108-574
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits04/13/2004 Referred to
04/29/2004 Hearings by
05/13/2004 Markup by
05/13/2004 Reported by
House Armed Services03/11/2004 Referred to
06/25/2004 Discharged from
Senate Veterans' Affairs09/07/2004 Referred to
10/09/2004 Discharged from