Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/11/2004
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/11/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/20/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/20/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/20/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/20/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/20/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/20/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/20/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/20/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/27/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/27/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/04/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/19/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/01/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 06/08/2004