Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/16/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/18/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/18/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/29/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 04/01/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/01/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 04/01/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/01/2004
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/30/2004