Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/17/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/20/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/22/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/22/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/16/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/16/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/16/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/16/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/16/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/22/2004