Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 02/05/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/11/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/11/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/11/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/13/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/13/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/13/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/13/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/27/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/27/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/27/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/27/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/11/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/11/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/11/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/18/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/01/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/01/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/08/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/08/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/29/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/29/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/19/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/02/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/02/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/02/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/04/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/11/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/17/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/19/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/23/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/23/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/26/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/10/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/14/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/24/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/30/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/15/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/15/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/04/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/04/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 11/19/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/24/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/25/2004