Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/24/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/29/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/29/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/01/2004
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/01/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/20/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/20/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/20/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/20/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/27/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/27/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/04/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/04/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/06/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/17/2004
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/17/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/20/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/01/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/01/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/01/2004
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/08/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/08/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/08/2004
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/08/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/08/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/08/2004
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/08/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/14/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/17/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/17/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/17/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 06/17/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/17/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/24/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/06/2004
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/06/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/13/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/07/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/07/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/07/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/07/2004
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/08/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/08/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/14/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/17/2004
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/17/2004
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/17/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/21/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/23/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/24/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/30/2004
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/05/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 10/05/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/06/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/06/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/07/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/19/2004