Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/01/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/01/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/01/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 04/01/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/20/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/28/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/06/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/12/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 06/16/2004
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/23/2004