Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/25/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/06/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/06/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/06/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/06/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/06/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/06/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/06/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/06/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/06/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/20/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/02/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/02/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/02/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/15/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/15/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/08/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/08/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/09/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/09/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/09/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/09/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/09/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/09/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/13/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/28/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/16/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/07/2004