Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/25/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/27/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/27/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/27/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/05/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/05/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/06/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/11/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/11/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/11/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/11/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/17/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/17/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/14/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/14/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/17/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/22/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/22/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/22/2004