Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/30/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/01/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/01/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/02/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/02/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/20/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/20/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/20/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/20/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/20/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/20/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/20/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/20/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/20/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/20/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/20/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/20/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/20/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/20/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/20/2004
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 04/20/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/22/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/22/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/22/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/22/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/22/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/22/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 04/27/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/27/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/27/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/27/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/27/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/27/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/27/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/27/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/28/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/28/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/28/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/28/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/28/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/28/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/04/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/04/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/04/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/04/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/04/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/04/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/04/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/04/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/04/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/04/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/04/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/04/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/04/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/04/2004
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/04/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/04/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/04/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/04/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/04/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/04/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/04/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/05/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/05/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/05/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/05/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/05/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/05/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/05/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/05/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/05/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/05/2004